WI SJR84 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Published 6-16-2022. Enrolled Joint Resolution 14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Published 6-16-2022. Enrolled Joint Resolution 14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To create section 35 of article IV of the constitution; Relating to: expenditure of moneys Wisconsin receives from the federal government (first consideration).
Title
Expenditure of moneys Wisconsin receives from the federal government (first consideration).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 concurred in (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Assembly: Concurred in as amended (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Adopted (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Assembly: Concurred in as amended (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Adopted (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-17 | Senate | Published 6-16-2022. Enrolled Joint Resolution 14 |
2022-04-15 | Senate | Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 4-15-2022 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Action ordered immediately messaged |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 concurred in, Ayes 20, Noes 11 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-8-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adopted |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-23 | House | Representative Born added as a cosponsor |
2022-02-23 | House | Concurred in as amended, Ayes 60, Noes 36, Paired 2 |
2022-02-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-23 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adopted |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 9:39 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-17 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-15 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Wittke |
2022-02-14 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Wittke |
2022-01-31 | House | Representative Magnafici added as a cosponsor |
2022-01-25 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 21, Noes 12 |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-25-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Report adoption recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Revenue, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Representative Dittrich added as a cosponsor |
2022-01-07 | Senate | Representative Kuglitsch added as a cosponsor |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Representative Schraa added as a cosponsor |
2022-01-03 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Revenue |
2022-01-03 | Senate | Introduced |