WI SJR8 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 42-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 42-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: Convention of the States for one or more Constitutional amendments restraining abuses of power by the federal government.
Title
Convention of the States for one or more Constitutional amendments restraining abuses of power by the federal government.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Representative Ramthun withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Representative Penterman added as a cosponsor |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Report adoption as amended recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Bernier |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced |