WI SJR68 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 35-14)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to: recognizing the victory of Team USA and captain Steve Stricker at the 2020 Ryder Cup.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing the victory of Team USA and captain Steve Stricker at the 2020 Ryder Cup.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-15HouseFailed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2021-11-12HouseRepresentative Murphy added as a cosponsor
2021-12-07HouseRead and referred to committee on Rules
2021-10-25HouseReceived from Senate
2021-10-25SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2021-10-25SenateAdopted
2021-10-22SenatePlaced on calendar 10-25-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2021-10-18SenateAvailable for scheduling
2021-10-18SenateRead and referred to Committee on Senate Organization
2021-10-18SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback