WI SJR52 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-6)
Status: Enrolled on January 30 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-30 - Report correctly enrolled on 1-30-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 30 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-30 - Report correctly enrolled on 1-30-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: commemorating the achievements and contributions of Western Technical College on the occasion of its centennial.
Title
Commemorating the achievements and contributions of Western Technical College on the occasion of its centennial.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-30 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled on 1-30-2012 |
2012-01-26 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2012-01-26 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-01-26 | House | Concurred in |
2012-01-24 | House | Placed on calendar 1-26-2012 by committee on Rules |
2012-01-24 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2012-01-24 | House | Received from Senate |
2012-01-24 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-01-24 | Senate | Adopted |
2012-01-24 | Senate | Senator Lassa added as a coauthor |
2012-01-23 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-24-2012 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2012-01-10 | Senate | Representative Pope-Roberts added as a cosponsor |
2012-01-10 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2012-01-10 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2012-01-10 | Senate | Introduced |