WI SJR49 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 22 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-08 - Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 22 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-08 - Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: honoring the life and public service of Rachel Ann Veum.
Title
Honoring the life and public service of Rachel Ann Veum.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-08 | Senate | Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 17 |
2017-07-19 | Senate | Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 7-19-2017 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2017-06-14 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-06-14 | House | Concurred in |
2017-06-14 | House | Rules suspended and taken up |
2017-06-14 | House | Read |
2017-06-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Carpenter, Craig, Feyen, LeMahieu, Marklein and Testin of the Senate added as coauthors |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Adopted by unanimous rising vote |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Read |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-14-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Senator Hansen added as a coauthor |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Introduced |