WI SJR42 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: congratulating Fight Crime: Invest in Kids on their 25th anniversary.
Title
Invest in Kids on their 25th anniversary.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-12-07 | House | Read and referred to committee on Rules |
2021-06-23 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Adopted |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-23-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Introduced |