WI SJR4 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-24 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-24 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: designating the state of Wisconsin's aviation heritage center.
Title
Designating the state of Wisconsin's aviation heritage center.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2017-03-09 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-03-09 | House | Concurred in |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on calendar 3-9-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-02-13 | House | Read and referred to committee on Rules |
2017-02-08 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-8-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Introduced |