WI SJR38 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: honoring Edward Wormhoudt.
Title
Honoring Edward Wormhoudt.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Laid on table |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Senator Cowles added as a coauthor |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-9-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/joint_resolution/sjr38 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SJR38.pdf |