WI SJR30 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 8 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to: proclaiming May 2017 as Gold Star Awareness Month in Wisconsin.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proclaiming May 2017 as Gold Star Awareness Month in Wisconsin.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-08SenateReport correctly enrolled
2017-05-03SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2017-05-02HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2017-05-02HouseConcurred in
2017-04-27HousePlaced on calendar 5-2-2017 by Committee on Rules
2017-04-24HouseRepresentative Shankland added as a cosponsor
2017-04-05HouseRepresentative Spiros added as a cosponsor
2017-04-04HouseRead and referred to committee on Rules
2017-04-04HouseReceived from Senate
2017-04-04SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2017-04-04SenateBewley, C. Larson, Cowles, Craig, Darling, Erpenbach, Feyen, Hansen, Harsdorf, Johnson, Kapenga, Lasee, LeMahieu, Olsen, Petrowski, Risser, Roth, S. Fitzgerald, Shilling, Tiffany, Vukmir and Wanggaard of the Senate added as coauthors
2017-04-04SenateAdopted
2017-04-04SenateSenator Miller added as a coauthor
2017-04-03SenateRepresentative C. Taylor added as a cosponsor
2017-03-31SenatePlaced on calendar 4-4-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2017-03-30SenateRepresentative Pope added as a cosponsor
2017-03-30SenateSenator Marklein added as a coauthor
2017-03-30SenateSenators Stroebel and Ringhand added as coauthors
2017-03-29SenateAvailable for scheduling
2017-03-29SenateRead and referred to Committee on Senate Organization
2017-03-29SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback