WI SJR22 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-5)
Status: Enrolled on April 21 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to: proclaiming April 2017 as Forestry and Paper Products Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proclaiming April 2017 as Forestry and Paper Products Month.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-21SenateReport correctly enrolled
2017-04-05SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2017-04-04HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2017-04-04HouseConcurred in
2017-04-04HouseRules suspended and taken up
2017-04-04HouseRead
2017-04-04HouseReceived from Senate
2017-04-04SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2017-04-04SenateAdopted
2017-04-04SenateRules suspended to withdraw from committee on Senate Organization and take up
2017-03-29SenateAvailable for scheduling
2017-03-29SenateRead and referred to Committee on Senate Organization
2017-03-29SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback