WI SJR18 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Enrolled on April 17 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 17 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: celebrating the University of Wisconsin-Oshkosh men's basketball team winning the National Collegiate Athletic Association Division III National Championship.
Title
Celebrating the University of Wisconsin-Oshkosh men's basketball team winning the National Collegiate Athletic Association Division III National Championship.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Feyen [R] | Sen. Scott Fitzgerald [R] | Sen. Roger Roth [R] | Rep. Gordon Hintz [D] |
Rep. Michael Schraa [R] | Rep. Amanda Stuck [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2019-04-09 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-04-09 | House | Concurred in |
2019-04-09 | House | Rules suspended and taken up |
2019-04-09 | House | Read |
2019-04-09 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-9-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Introduced |