WI SJR18 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 52-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Representative Jarchow withdrawn as a cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to: application to Congress under the provisions of Article V of the Constitution of the United States for a convention for proposing amendments relating to a balanced budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Application to Congress under the provisions of Article V of the Constitution of the United States for a convention for proposing amendments relating to a balanced budget.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28SenateRepresentative Jarchow withdrawn as a cosponsor
2017-03-30SenateAvailable for scheduling
2017-03-30SenateReport adoption as amended recommended by Committee on Financial Services, Constitution and Federalism, Ayes 3, Noes 2
2017-03-30SenateReport adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Financial Services, Constitution and Federalism, Ayes 4, Noes 1
2017-03-30SenateExecutive action taken
2017-03-30SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Kapenga
2017-03-28SenatePublic hearing held
2017-03-16SenateRead and referred to Committee on Financial Services, Constitution and Federalism
2017-03-16SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback