WI SJR12 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: applying to Congress under the provisions of Article V of the Constitution of the United States for a convention to propose an amendment establishing term limits for members of the United States House of Representatives and the United States Senate.
Title
Applying to Congress under the provisions of Article V of the Constitution of the United States for a convention to propose an amendment establishing term limits for members of the United States House of Representatives and the United States Senate.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Representative Penterman added as a cosponsor |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Representative Zimmerman added as a cosponsor |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Report adoption recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |