WI SJR12 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-03 - Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-03 - Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: the life and public service of John Herschel Glenn Jr.
Title
The life and public service of John Herschel Glenn Jr.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-03 | Senate | Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 9 |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 4-28-2017 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2017-03-09 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-03-09 | House | Representative Spreitzer added as a cosponsor |
2017-03-09 | House | Concurred in |
2017-03-09 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up |
2017-03-07 | House | Read and referred to committee on Rules |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-7-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |