WI SJR11 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-8)
Status: Enrolled on May 13 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - Report correctly enrolled on 5-13-2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 13 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - Report correctly enrolled on 5-13-2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: recognizing 2011 as World Veterinary Year.
Title
Recognizing 2011 as World Veterinary Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-25 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-13 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled on 5-13-2011 |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2011-05-11 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2011-05-11 | House | Concurred in |
2011-05-09 | House | Placed on calendar 5-11-2011 by committee on Rules |
2011-02-28 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2011-02-28 | House | Received from Senate |
2011-02-25 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2011-02-25 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 19, Noes 0 |
2011-02-24 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-25-2011 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Introduced |