WI SJR11 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on January 29 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-16 - Published 2-22-2010, 8-3-2010, 9-7-2010, 10-5-2010. Enrolled Joint Resolution 27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 29 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-16 - Published 2-22-2010, 8-3-2010, 9-7-2010, 10-5-2010. Enrolled Joint Resolution 27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To renumber section 23a of article IV; and to create section 23a (2) of article IV of the constitution; relating to: veto power of county executive over appropriations (first consideration).
Title
Veto power of county executive over appropriations (first consideration).
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Carpenter [D] | Sen. Sheila Harsdorf [R] | Sen. John Lehman [D] | Rep. Thomas Lothian [R] |
Rep. Sandra Pasch [D] | Rep. John Townsend [R] | Rep. Terry Van Akkeren [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | Published 2-22-2010, 8-3-2010, 9-7-2010, 10-5-2010. Enrolled Joint Resolution 27 | |
2010-02-08 | Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 2-8-2010. | |
2010-01-29 | Report correctly enrolled on 1-29-2010 | |
2010-01-26 | Received from Assembly concurred in | |
2010-01-26 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-01-26 | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 97, Noes 1 | |
2010-01-26 | Rules suspended | |
2010-01-26 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-01-26 | Representative Ziegelbauer added as a cosponsor | |
2010-01-26 | Read a second time | |
2010-01-20 | Placed on calendar 1-26-2010 by committee on Rules | |
2010-01-12 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-01-12 | Report concurrence recommended by committee on State Affairs and Homeland Security, Ayes 8, Noes 0 | |
2009-12-17 | Executive action taken | |
2009-12-03 | Public hearing held | |
2009-09-16 | Read first time and referred to committee on State Affairs and Homeland Security | |
2009-09-16 | Received from Senate | |
2009-09-15 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-09-15 | Read a third time and adopted, Ayes 32, Noes 0 | |
2009-09-15 | Rules suspended | |
2009-09-15 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-09-15 | Read a second time | |
2009-09-08 | Placed on calendar 9-15-2009 by committee on Senate Organization | |
2009-06-03 | Available for scheduling | |
2009-06-03 | Report adoption recommended by committee on Ethics Reform and Government Operations, Ayes 4, Noes 1 | |
2009-06-03 | Executive action taken | |
2009-04-29 | Public hearing held | |
2009-02-05 | Read first time and referred to committee on Ethics Reform and Government Operations | |
2009-02-05 | Introduced |