WI SJR101 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Enrolled on March 2 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-02 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 2 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-02 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: proclaiming May 18, 19, and 20, 2018, Syttende Mai Weekend.
Title
Proclaiming May 18, 19, and 20, 2018, Syttende Mai Weekend.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-02 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2018-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-22 | House | Representative Zamarripa added as a cosponsor |
2018-02-22 | House | Concurred in |
2018-02-22 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up |
2018-02-22 | House | Read and referred to committee on Rules |
2018-02-22 | House | Received from Senate |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Representative Sargent added as a cosponsor |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Introduced |