WI SJR1 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 11 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-01-17 - Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 1-17-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to: the session schedule for the 2019-2020 biennial session period.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The session schedule for the 2019-2020 biennial session period.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-07 - House - Assembly: Concurred in (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-07 - Senate - Senate: Adopted (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-17SenateDeposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 1-17-2019
2019-01-11SenateReport correctly enrolled
2019-01-08SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2019-01-07HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2019-01-07HouseConcurred in, Ayes 97, Noes 1
2019-01-07HouseRules suspended and taken up
2019-01-07HouseRead
2019-01-07HouseReceived from Senate
2019-01-07SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2019-01-07SenateAdopted, Ayes 27, Noes 5
2019-01-07SenateConsidered as privileged and taken up
2019-01-07SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback