WI SB970 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Representative Doyle added as a cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Representative Doyle added as a cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 940.20 (2r) and 940.20 (7); to amend 48.685 (2) (bb), 48.685 (5) (bm) 4., 48.686 (1) (c) 9., 48.686 (1) (c) 12., 48.686 (2) (bb), 50.065 (2) (bb), 103.88 (1) (d), 165.84 (7) (ab) 2., 301.048 (2) (bm) 1. a., 767.461 (4), 940.03, 941.29 (1g) (a), 941.291 (1) (b), 949.03 (1) (b), 968.26 (1b) (a) 2. a., 969.08 (10) (b) and 973.123 (1); and to create 103.88 (1) (bd) and 940.204 of the statutes; Relating to: battery or threat to a health care provider or staff member of a health care facility and providing a penalty.
Title
Battery or threat to a health care provider or staff member of a health care facility and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Senate | Representative Doyle added as a cosponsor |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 2 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Representative Milroy added as a cosponsor |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Representatives Murphy and Wichgers added as cosponsors |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senator Marklein added as a coauthor |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Representative Oldenburg added as a cosponsor |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Introduced |