WI SB95 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Received from Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 119.04 (1); and to create 118.2935 of the statutes; Relating to: information about sudden cardiac arrest during youth athletic activities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Information about sudden cardiac arrest during youth athletic activities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-23HouseReceived from Senate
2021-03-23SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2021-03-23SenateRead a third time and passed
2021-03-23SenateRules suspended
2021-03-23SenateOrdered to a third reading
2021-03-23SenateSenate Amendment 2 adopted
2021-03-23SenateSenate Amendment 1 adopted
2021-03-23SenateRead a second time
2021-03-19SenatePlaced on calendar 3-23-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2021-03-17SenateSenate Amendment 2 offered by Senators Kapenga and Darling
2021-03-12SenateLRB correction
2021-03-09SenateAvailable for scheduling
2021-03-09SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 4, Noes 1
2021-03-09SenateReport adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 4, Noes 1
2021-03-04SenateExecutive action taken
2021-03-05SenateRepresentative S. Rodriguez added as a cosponsor
2021-03-03SenateLRB correction (Senate Amendment 1)
2021-02-23SenatePublic hearing held
2021-02-25SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Darling
2021-02-18SenateRepresentative Vruwink added as a cosponsor
2021-02-11SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Education
2021-02-11SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback