WI SB941 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 6.275 (2); to amend 5.05 (2m) (e) and 5.05 (4); and to create 5.05 (19), 6.275 (1) (ab), 6.275 (1) (db), 6.275 (1) (eb), 6.275 (1) (ec), 6.275 (1) (ed), 6.275 (1) (ee), 6.275 (1) (ef), 6.275 (1) (eg), 6.275 (1) (eh), 6.275 (1) (g), 6.275 (1m), 6.275 (2) (b), 6.36 (7) and 16.54 (8s) of the statutes; Relating to: overseeing the administration of elections. (FE)
Title
Overseeing the administration of elections. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 58 N: 32 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 58 N: 32 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 rejected (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 58 N: 32 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 rejected (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Senate | Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-17-2022 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Report vetoed by the Governor on 4-8-2022 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-5-2022 by directive of the Majority Leader |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2022-03-02 | Senate | LRB correction |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2022-02-24 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-24 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 58, Noes 32, Paired 4 |
2022-02-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-24 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-24 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 58, Noes 32 |
2022-02-24 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Spreitzer, Vruwink, Ohnstad, Hebl, Cabrera, Considine, Andraca, Snodgrass, Shelton, Hong, Conley, Brostoff, Subeck, S. Rodriguez, Haywood, Vining, Shankland, Hesselbein, Baldeh, Doyle, B. Meyers, Anderson, Neubauer, Riemer, Pope, Hintz, Ortiz-Velez and Emerson |
2022-02-24 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-23 | House | Made a special order of business at 8:12 AM on 2-24-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 30 |
2022-02-23 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-23 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 21, Noes 12 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 rejected, Ayes 21, Noes 12 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Carpenter, Smith and Ringhand |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-22-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Elections, Election Process Reform and Ethics, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Representative Schraa added as a cosponsor |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senator Ballweg added as a coauthor |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senator Felzkowski added as a coauthor |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Elections, Election Process Reform and Ethics |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced |