WI SB940 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 5.056; and to create 6.50 (2v) of the statutes; Relating to: comparison of voter information on the state's official voter registration list with information maintained by the Department of Transportation. (FE)
Title
Comparison of voter information on the state's official voter registration list with information maintained by the Department of Transportation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 59 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 59 N: 36 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 59 N: 36 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Senate | Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-17-2022 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Report vetoed by the Governor on 4-8-2022 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-5-2022 by directive of the Majority Leader |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2022-02-24 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-24 | House | Representatives Steffen and Skowronski added as cosponsors |
2022-02-24 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 59, Noes 36, Paired 2 |
2022-02-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-24 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-24 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 59, Noes 36 |
2022-02-24 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives S. Rodriguez, Emerson, Moore Omokunde, Spreitzer, Hintz, Brostoff, Conley, Doyle, Drake, Andraca, Billings, Considine, Haywood, Hebl, Hesselbein, Hong, Baldeh, Ohnstad, McGuire, B. Meyers, Pope, Neubauer, Shankland, Snodgrass, Sinicki, Shelton, Subeck, Vining, Vruwink, Anderson and Cabrera |
2022-02-24 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-23 | House | Made a special order of business at 8:11 AM on 2-24-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 30 |
2022-02-23 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-02-23 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-23 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 21, Noes 12 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-22-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Elections, Election Process Reform and Ethics, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Representative Schraa added as a cosponsor |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Elections, Election Process Reform and Ethics |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced |