WI SB94 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Representative Anderson added as a cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Representative Anderson added as a cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 165.775 of the statutes; Relating to: tracking of sexual assault kits in sexual assault cases, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Tracking of sexual assault kits in sexual assault cases, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-11 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | Representative Anderson added as a cosponsor |
2021-12-07 | Senate | Published 12-7-2021 |
2021-12-07 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 12-6-2021. 2021 Wisconsin Act 117 |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 12-2-2021 |
2021-11-15 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2021-11-15 | Senate | LRB correction |
2021-11-15 | Senate | LRB correction (Senate Amendment 1) |
2021-11-12 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2021-11-11 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-11-11 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 98, Noes 0 |
2021-11-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-11-11 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-11-11 | House | Read a second time |
2021-11-09 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2021-11-09 | House | Placed on calendar 11-11-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-10-14 | House | Representative Shelton added as a cosponsor |
2021-09-08 | House | Representative Bowen added as a cosponsor |
2021-03-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 32, Noes 0 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-16-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Darling |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced |