WI SB936 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 7.08 (6); to amend 5.05 (5e); and to create 5.05 (2n), 5.05 (5s) (an), 5.05 (19), 5.05 (20), 7.08 (6) (a) 1. to 3. and (b), 9.01 (1) (b) 13. and 13.94 (1) (w) of the statutes; Relating to: the resolution of complaints filed with the Elections Commission, submitting to the legislature copies of complaints filed with the Elections Commission, reports concerning possible violations of election laws, postelection audits of electronic voting systems, printing absentee ballot applications for recounts, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
The resolution of complaints filed with the Elections Commission, submitting to the legislature copies of complaints filed with the Elections Commission, reports concerning possible violations of election laws, postelection audits of electronic voting systems, printing absentee ballot applications for recounts, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 59 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Senate | Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-17-2022 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a) |
2022-04-15 | Senate | Report vetoed by the Governor on 4-15-2022 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-14-2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2022-02-24 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-24 | House | Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor |
2022-02-24 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 59, Noes 35, Paired 2 |
2022-02-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-24 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-24 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-23 | House | Made a special order of business at 8:07 AM on 2-24-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 30 |
2022-02-23 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-23 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 21, Noes 12 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Bernier |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-22-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Elections, Election Process Reform and Ethics, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senator Ballweg added as a coauthor |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Elections, Election Process Reform and Ethics |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced |