WI SB925 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 100.435 of the statutes; Relating to: the sale of counterfeit lighters and unsafe lighters.
Title
The sale of counterfeit lighters and unsafe lighters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced |