WI SB91 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 13.172 (1), 13.48 (13) (a), 13.62 (2), 13.94 (4) (a) 1., 13.95 (intro.), 16.002 (2), 16.004 (4), 16.004 (5), 16.004 (12) (a), 16.045 (1) (a), 16.15 (1) (ab), 16.41 (4), 16.417 (1) (b), 16.52 (7), 16.528 (1) (a), 16.53 (2), 16.54 (9) (a) 1., 16.765 (1), 16.765 (2), 16.765 (5), 16.765 (6), 16.765 (7) (intro.), 16.765 (7) (d), 16.765 (8), 16.85 (2), 16.865 (8), 71.05 (6) (b) 28. (intro.), am. and h., 77.54 (9a) (a), 100.45 (1) (dm) and 230.03 (3); and to create 13.94 (1) (dt), 13.94 (1s) (c) 9., 19.42 (10) (t), 19.42 (13) (q), 20.195, 39.28 (7), 39.52, 39.54, 39.56, 40.02 (54) (n), 70.11 (38v), 71.05 (6) (b) 28. j., 224.30 (6) and chapter 239 of the statutes; Relating to: student loans, the individual income tax subtract modification for tuition and student fees, creating an authority to be known as the Wisconsin Student Loan Refinancing Authority, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student loans, the individual income tax subtract modification for tuition and student fees, creating an authority to be known as the Wisconsin Student Loan Refinancing Authority, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28SenateFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2017-03-22SenateFiscal estimate received
2017-03-22SenateFiscal estimate received
2017-03-22SenateFiscal estimate received
2017-03-16SenateFiscal estimate received
2017-03-02SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Technical Colleges
2017-03-02SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback