WI SB888 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 20.115 (1) (r), 100.26 (9), 100.30 and 100.33 (1) (g); to renumber 100.51 (1) (a) and 951.10 (1); to amend 100.201 (2) (h) 5., 100.264 (2) (intro.), 100.33 (1) (c), 100.33 (1) (h), 100.51 (6) (a), 134.04 (1), 139.39 (3), 814.04 (intro.) and 951.10 (2); and to create 100.33 (1) (em), 100.51 (1) (ag) and 951.10 (1g) of the statutes; Relating to: eliminating minimum markup requirements and the prohibition on sales below cost. (FE)
Title
Eliminating minimum markup requirements and the prohibition on sales below cost. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Representative Brandtjen added as a cosponsor |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Introduced |