WI SB88 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-4)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-4)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 29.193 (1m) (a) 2. (intro.), 29.193 (2) (b) 2., 29.193 (2) (c) 3., 29.193 (2) (cd) 2. b., 29.193 (2) (cd) 2. c., 29.193 (2) (e) and 29.193 (3) (a) of the statutes; Relating to: the authority of physician assistants and advanced practice nurse prescribers regarding testing and information required for making disability determinations under certain hunting and fishing approvals issued by the Department of Natural Resources.
Title
The authority of physician assistants and advanced practice nurse prescribers regarding testing and information required for making disability determinations under certain hunting and fishing approvals issued by the Department of Natural Resources.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-11-02 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-11-02 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining, and Forestry, Ayes 4, Noes 0 |
2015-10-30 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-10-28 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Representative Spreitzer added as a cosponsor |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining, and Forestry |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb88 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB88.pdf |