WI SB870 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber 452.14 (2); to renumber and amend 452.14 (4m) (a); to amend 452.01 (5g), 452.14 (4r), 452.17 (1), 452.17 (3), 452.19 (1), 452.23 (title) and 452.23 (4); to repeal and recreate 452.23 (3); and to create 452.07 (4), 452.12 (5) (e), 452.14 (2) (b), 452.14 (2) (c), 452.14 (3) (im), 452.14 (4m) (a) 1., 452.23 (5) and 710.13 of the statutes; Relating to: various changes regarding the laws governing real estate practice, disclosures regarding real property wholesalers, and providing a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Various changes regarding the laws governing real estate practice, disclosures regarding real property wholesalers, and providing a penalty.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-15SenateFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2024-03-06SenateAvailable for scheduling
2024-03-06SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Housing, Rural Issues and Forestry, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2024-03-06SenateReport adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Housing, Rural Issues and Forestry, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2024-03-06SenateExecutive action taken
2024-02-21SenateRepresentative Penterman added as a cosponsor
2024-02-20SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jagler
2024-02-08SenatePublic hearing held
2024-01-05SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Housing, Rural Issues and Forestry
2024-01-05SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback