WI SB867 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 77.82 (1) (bp) 2. g., 77.83 (2) (ar) and 77.88 (3m); to renumber and amend 77.82 (11); to amend 70.365, 77.82 (1) (a) 1., 77.82 (4), 77.84 (1), 77.88 (2) (ac) 3., 77.88 (2) (c), 77.88 (3) (am), 77.88 (3) (b) (intro.), 77.88 (3j) (title), 77.88 (3j) (a) 1., 77.88 (3k), 77.88 (3L) and 77.88 (5m); and to create 77.82 (1) (bp) 4. and 77.82 (3) (h) of the statutes; Relating to: the managed forest land program. (FE)
Title
The managed forest land program. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Tiffany |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb867 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB867.pdf |