WI SB85 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Published 4-24-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Published 4-24-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 940.32 (1) (a) 6. and 940.32 (1) (a) 7. of the statutes; Relating to: stalking and providing a penalty.
Title
Stalking and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Published 4-24-2021 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-23-2021. 2021 Wisconsin Act 28 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-22-2021 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2021-04-13 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-04-13 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2021-04-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-04-13 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-04-13 | House | Read a second time |
2021-04-13 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on calendar 4-13-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-04-08 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2021-03-23 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-23-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Representatives Stubbs and Bowen added as cosponsors |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Representative Skowronski added as a cosponsor |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Representative Edming added as a cosponsor |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced |