WI SB838 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 196.485 (1) (cr) and 196.485 (3g) of the statutes; Relating to: an incumbent transmission facility owner's right to construct, own, and maintain certain transmission facilities.
Title
An incumbent transmission facility owner's right to construct, own, and maintain certain transmission facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Julian Bradley [R] | Sen. Roger Roth [R] | Sen. Brad Pfaff [D] | Sen. Van Wanggaard [R] |
Rep. Tyler Vorpagel [R] | Rep. Mike Kuglitsch [R] | Rep. David Steffen [R] | Rep. Gary Tauchen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Representative Murphy added as a cosponsor |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Senator Smith added as a coauthor |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Utilities, Technology and Telecommunications |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2021/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb838 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2021/REG/SB838.pdf |