WI SB833 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Published 4-1-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Published 4-1-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 39.51 (5); and to amend 20.235 (1) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: grants to support the teaching of college courses in high schools. (FE)
Title
Grants to support the teaching of college courses in high schools. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | Senate | Published 4-1-2022 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-31-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 217 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-30-2022 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2022-02-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 9:02 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-22 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 33, Noes 0 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-22-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Kooyenga |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Representative Ramthun added as a cosponsor |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senator Pfaff added as a coauthor |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Introduced |