WI SB827 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-3)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Published 3-23-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-3)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Published 3-23-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.115 (3) (h) and 93.06 (1qm) of the statutes; Relating to: grants for dairy exports promotion and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Grants for dairy exports promotion and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Senate | Published 3-23-2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-22-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 207 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-21-2022 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 96, Noes 0 |
2022-02-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 8:59 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-17 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-15 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 31, Noes 1 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-15-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture and Tourism, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Representatives Kitchens, Spreitzer and Plumer added as cosponsors |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture and Tourism |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Introduced |