WI SB82 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-3)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-04 - Representative Penterman added as a cosponsor
Pending: Senate Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 97.45 of the statutes; Relating to: labeling a food product as meat and granting rule-making authority. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Labeling a food product as meat and granting rule-making authority. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-04SenateRepresentative Penterman added as a cosponsor
2021-05-11SenateReferred to committee on Senate Organization
2021-05-11SenateRead a second time
2021-05-07SenatePlaced on calendar 5-11-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2021-03-09SenateRepresentative Ramthun added as a cosponsor
2021-02-22SenateRepresentative Edming added as a cosponsor
2021-02-16SenateRepresentative Born added as a cosponsor
2021-02-12SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque
2021-02-11SenateAvailable for scheduling
2021-02-11SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture and Tourism, Ayes 7, Noes 1
2021-02-11SenateExecutive action taken
2021-02-11SenateFiscal estimate received
2021-02-09SenatePublic hearing held
2021-02-08SenateRepresentative Plumer added as a cosponsor
2021-02-05SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture and Tourism
2021-02-05SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback