WI SB811 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 66.1105 (2) (ab) and 66.1105 (2) (cm); to amend 66.0617 (7), 66.1105 (4) (f), 66.1105 (4m) (b) 2., 66.1105 (6) (g) 1. (intro.), 66.1105 (6) (g) 1. a. and 66.1105 (6) (g) 3.; and to create 66.10012, 66.1105 (2) (cm) 2., 66.1105 (2) (n) 1. and 66.1105 (2) (n) 2. of the statutes; Relating to: making changes related to mixed-use tax incremental financing districts, increasing the amount of time a city or village may extend the life of a tax incremental district to improve its affordable and workforce housing, allowing a reduction in the amount of certain impact fees, and authorizing local units of government to implement workforce housing initiatives. (FE)
Title
Making changes related to mixed-use tax incremental financing districts, increasing the amount of time a city or village may extend the life of a tax incremental district to improve its affordable and workforce housing, allowing a reduction in the amount of certain impact fees, and authorizing local units of government to implement workforce housing initiatives. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Feyen |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Feyen |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Trade |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb811 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB811.pdf |