WI SB809 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 943.10 (1m) (intro.) of the statutes; Relating to: entering certain places with intent to commit battery and providing a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Entering certain places with intent to commit battery and providing a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-15HouseFailed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2024-03-14HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Rules
2024-02-20HouseReceived from Senate
2024-02-20SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2024-02-20SenateRead a third time and passed, Ayes 24, Noes 8
2024-02-20SenateRules suspended to give bill its third reading
2024-02-20SenateOrdered to a third reading
2024-02-20SenateRead a second time
2024-02-19SenatePlaced on calendar 2-20-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2024-02-15SenateAvailable for scheduling
2024-02-15SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 4, Noes 3
2024-02-15SenateExecutive action taken
2024-01-11SenatePublic hearing held
2023-12-12SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2023-12-12SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback