WI SB800 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 59.69 (4m) (a), 59.69 (4m) (b), 60.64 (1), 60.64 (2), 62.23 (7) (em) 1. and 62.23 (7) (em) 2.; and to create 59.69 (4m) (bm), 60.64 (2m) and 62.23 (7) (em) 2m. of the statutes; Relating to: local regulation of historic properties. (FE)
Title
Local regulation of historic properties. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Constitution and Federalism |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb800 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB800.pdf |