WI SB80 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 36.25 (58) of the statutes; Relating to: funding for certain extension services of the University of Wisconsin System and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Funding for certain extension services of the University of Wisconsin System and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Representatives Kitchens and Shankland added as cosponsors |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Representatives Spreitzer, Vruwink and Considine added as cosponsors |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Marklein |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Representative Edming added as a cosponsor |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Representative Spiros added as a cosponsor |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Technical Colleges |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Introduced |