WI SB794 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-15 - Published 4-16-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-15 - Published 4-16-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 71.775 (1) (b); to renumber and amend 71.76 (2); to consolidate, renumber and amend 71.775 (1) (intro.) and (a); to amend 71.365 (6), 71.78 (1), 71.88 and 73.16 (4); and to create 71.738 (3d), 71.738 (3e), 71.738 (3f), 71.745, 71.76 (2) (b), 71.77 (7) (c), 71.78 (11), 71.80 (26) and 71.83 (1) (a) 12. of the statutes; Relating to: pass-through entity audits. (FE)
Title
Pass-through entity audits. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Howard Marklein [R] | Sen. Dale Kooyenga [R] | Rep. Robert Wittke [R] | Rep. David Armstrong [R] |
Rep. Robert Brooks [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-15 | Senate | Published 4-16-2022 |
2022-04-15 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-15-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 262 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-14-2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 95, Noes 0 |
2022-02-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 8:53 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-17 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2022-01-25 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 32, Noes 0 |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 adopted |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-25-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Revenue, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Revenue, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Marklein |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Marklein |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-12-21 | Senate | Representative Knodl added as a cosponsor |
2021-12-17 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Revenue |
2021-12-17 | Senate | Introduced |