WI SB79 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 30-9)
Status: Passed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - Published 8-3-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 30-9)
Status: Passed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - Published 8-3-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 69.30 (2m) of the statutes; Relating to: authorizing county clerks and clerks of court to copy certified birth certificates for certain purposes.
Title
Authorizing county clerks and clerks of court to copy certified birth certificates for certain purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-02 | Senate | Published 8-3-2017 |
2017-08-02 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 8-2-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 48 |
2017-08-01 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 8-1-2017 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2017-06-14 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-06-14 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2017-06-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-06-14 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-06-14 | House | Read a second time |
2017-06-14 | House | Representative Barca added as a cosponsor |
2017-06-07 | House | Placed on calendar 6-14-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-05-19 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-05-19 | House | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2017-05-17 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-05-15 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Local Government |
2017-05-10 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read a second time |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-10-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Local Government, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Local Government, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator LeMahieu |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Local Government |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |