WI SB78 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 111.335 (3) (a); to renumber and amend 973.015 (1m) (a) 1.; to amend 111.335 (4) (b), 111.335 (4) (c) 1. (intro.), 111.335 (4) (e), 111.335 (4) (f) 1., 950.04 (1v) (g), 973.015 (1m) (b) and 973.25 (1) (a); and to create 111.335 (3) (ag), 111.335 (3) (g), 973.015 (1b), 973.015 (1m) (a) 1. a. and b., 973.015 (1m) (a) 3. c. and d. and 4., 973.015 (1m) (c) and 973.015 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: expungement of records of certain crimes and discrimination based on expunged conviction. (FE)
Title
Expungement of records of certain crimes and discrimination based on expunged conviction. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-10-19 | Senate | LRB correction |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Representative Ramthun withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 2 |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Representative Hong added as a cosponsor |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Representative Conley added as a cosponsor |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Representative Callahan added as a cosponsor |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Representative Ramthun added as a cosponsor |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Introduced |