WI SB770 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-28 - Published 2-28-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-28 - Published 2-28-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal subchapter VI (title) of chapter 601 [precedes 601.93]; to amend 601.45 (1); and to create 16.5285, 20.145 (5), subchapter VII (title) of chapter 601 [precedes 601.80], 601.80, 601.83, 601.85 and subchapter VIII (title) of chapter 601 [precedes 601.93] of the statutes; Relating to: Wisconsin Healthcare Stability Plan, reinsurance of health carriers, reallocating savings from health insurer fee, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and making appropriations. (FE)
Title
Wisconsin Healthcare Stability Plan, reinsurance of health carriers, reallocating savings from health insurer fee, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and making appropriations. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 79 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 60 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 rejected (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 60 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 rejected (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | Senate | Published 2-28-2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 2-27-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 138 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 2-26-2018 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | LRB correction (Senate Substitute Amendment 1) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2018-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-20 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 79, Noes 16 |
2018-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 60, Noes 35 |
2018-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Hintz, Hesselbein, Spreitzer, Doyle, Riemer, Vruwink, Neubauer, Brostoff, Wachs, Subeck, Sinicki, Kessler, Meyers, Hebl, Ohnstad, Kolste, Considine, Berceau, Shankland, Barca and Billings |
2018-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-20 | House | Rules suspended and taken up |
2018-02-20 | House | Read |
2018-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 23, Noes 9 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 rejected, Ayes 18, Noes 14 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senators Erpenbach, Miller, Ringhand, Risser, Carpenter, Vinehout, Schachtner, L. Taylor, Larson, Johnson, Hansen, Bewley and Shilling |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 13, Noes 3 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 4 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Report introduction of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Report introduction of Senate Amendment 2 by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Report introduction of Senate Amendment 1 by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Representative Petersen added as a cosponsor |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Joint Committee on Finance |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduced |