WI SB763 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 601.427; to amend 626.31 (1) (b); and to create 601.465 (1m) (d), 601.465 (2m) (e) to (i), 601.465 (3) (e), 610.80 and 645.31 (16) of the statutes; Relating to: disclosures to the commissioner of insurance and other changes to the insurance laws, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from emergency rule-making procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disclosures to the commissioner of insurance and other changes to the insurance laws, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from emergency rule-making procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28SenateFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2018-02-22SenateFiscal estimate received
2018-02-16SenateAvailable for scheduling
2018-02-16SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Constitution and Federalism, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2018-02-14SenateExecutive action taken
2018-02-14SenatePublic hearing held
2018-02-01SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Constitution and Federalism
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback