WI SB758 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.435 (7) (tf), 20.435 (7) (th), 20.435 (7) (tj), 20.435 (7) (tL), 20.435 (7) (tn), 20.435 (7) (tp), 25.17 (1) (jn), 25.776, 25.777, 25.778, 71.05 (6) (b) 53., 71.05 (6) (b) 54., 71.05 (6) (b) 55., 71.07 (5) (a) 10., 146.92 and 815.18 (3) (q) of the statutes; Relating to: long-term care investment accounts and making appropriations. (FE)
Title
Long-term care investment accounts and making appropriations. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions and Rural Issues |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb758 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB758.pdf |