WI SB750 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 227.51 (3); to amend 440.205, 440.22 (1), 440.22 (2), 448.02 (4), 448.02 (8) (a), 448.02 (9) (intro.), 448.675 (2) and 450.01 (24); and to create 227.51 (3) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: wholesale distributors subject to Pharmacy Examining Board requirements and enforcement and disciplinary authority of the Department of Safety and Professional Services and attached boards and credentialing boards. (FE)
Title
Wholesale distributors subject to Pharmacy Examining Board requirements and enforcement and disciplinary authority of the Department of Safety and Professional Services and attached boards and credentialing boards. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb750 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB750.pdf |