WI SB748 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 45.01 (12) (k) of the statutes; Relating to: indication of veteran status of former service member on an operator's license or identification card. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Indication of veteran status of former service member on an operator's license or identification card. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-15SenateFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2024-04-10SenateSenator Pfaff added as a coauthor
2024-02-20SenateFiscal estimate received
2024-01-02SenateFiscal estimate received
2023-12-08SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Labor, Regulatory Reform, Veterans and Military Affairs
2023-12-08SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback