WI SB738 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 450.062 (intro.); to renumber 450.062 (1) to (4); to renumber and amend 450.09 (2); to amend 450.06 (1), 450.06 (2) (b), 450.06 (2m), 450.09 (1) (a) and 450.09 (2) (title); and to create 450.01 (21c), 450.02 (5) and 450.09 (2) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: licensing and regulation of pharmacies and remote dispensing sites under the pharmacy practice law, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from rule-making procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Licensing and regulation of pharmacies and remote dispensing sites under the pharmacy practice law, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from rule-making procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Feyen [R] | Sen. Timothy Carpenter [D] | Rep. David Murphy [R] | Rep. Kenneth Skowronski [R] |
Rep. Nick Milroy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Feyen |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb738 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB738.pdf |