WI SB73 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.455 (2) (hd) and 48.48 (19); and to create 20.437 (1) (hf), 814.75 (28), 814.76 (21), 944.35 and 973.05 (2m) (fr) of the statutes; Relating to: prostitution crime surcharge and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Prostitution crime surcharge and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-07-07 | Senate | Representative Joers added as a cosponsor |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senators Wanggaard and Hutton added as coauthors |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Representative Haywood added as a cosponsor |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Introduced |