WI SB720 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 71.775 (1) (b), 77.51 (13gm) (a) 1. and 2., 77.51 (13gm) (d) 1. and 77.51 (13gm) (d) 3. and 4.; to renumber and amend 77.51 (13gm) (a) (intro.); to consolidate, renumber and amend 71.775 (1) (intro.) and (a); to amend 48.561 (3) (a) 3., 48.561 (3) (b), 59.25 (3) (i), 66.0602 (3) (h) 2. a., 66.0602 (6) (a), 66.0602 (6) (b), 66.1105 (6m) (d) 4., 70.46 (4), 70.855 (4) (b), 70.995 (8) (c) 1., 70.995 (8) (d), 70.995 (14) (b), 71.04 (1) (a), 71.04 (1) (b) (intro.), 71.04 (3) (b), 71.04 (4) (intro.), 71.04 (9), 71.05 (6) (b) 4., 71.07 (9m) (h), 71.25 (6) (intro.), 71.28 (6) (h), 71.47 (6) (h), 71.55 (10), 71.76, 71.77 (7) (b), 71.78 (1), 71.87, 73.0305, 73.09 (4) (c), 73.09 (5), 73.16 (4), 74.315 (1), 74.315 (2), 74.315 (3), 76.04 (1), 76.07 (1), 76.075, 76.13 (3), 76.28 (4) (b), 76.28 (11), 76.39 (4) (d), 76.48 (5), 77.51 (13gm) (b), 77.51 (13gm) (c), 77.51 (13gm) (d) 2., 77.51 (13gm) (d) 5., 77.52 (2m) (b), 77.54 (6) (am) 2., 77.54 (9a) (f), 79.02 (1), 79.02 (2) (b), 79.02 (3) (a), 79.02 (3) (e), 79.035 (6), 79.035 (7) (b), 79.05 (1) (am) and 79.05 (2m); and to create 71.04 (1) (c), 71.04 (9m), 71.52 (1g), 71.738 (3c), 71.738 (3d), 71.738 (3f), 71.738 (3g), 71.738 (5b), 71.745, 71.75 (11), 71.78 (11), 71.80 (26), 71.80 (27), 71.83 (1) (a) 12., 74.315 (1m) and 77.61 (5) (b) 8m. of the statutes; Relating to: various changes to the laws administered and enforced by the Department of Revenue. (FE)
Title
Various changes to the laws administered and enforced by the Department of Revenue. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Howard Marklein [R] | Sen. Dale Kooyenga [R] | Sen. Jeff Smith [D] | Rep. Robert Wittke [R] |
Rep. John Macco [R] | Rep. Terry Katsma [R] | Rep. Shannon Zimmerman [R] | Rep. Tod Ohnstad [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Amendment 2 adopted |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a third time and concurred in as amended |
2020-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 adopted |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Wittke |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Tusler, Steffen, Snyder and McGuire |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-20 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from Senate message and take up |
2020-02-20 | House | Read |
2020-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 33, Noes 0 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 3 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read a second time |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-19-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 3 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Marklein |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Marklein |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Marklein |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Marklein |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Introduced |